Marzouk, Abdulla Georgi (CPSO#: 54504)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English

Education:Medical Academy Sofia, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2015