Mascarin, Robert (CPSO#: 32547)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
345 Lakeshore Road East
Suite 502
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone: (905) 845-4511
Fax: (905) 845-8133
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mascarin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mascarin ( CPSO# 32547 )

Business Address:
502 - 345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON  L6L 1J5
Phone Number: (905) 845-4511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MASCARIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASCARIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1981