Masellis, Mario (CPSO#: 76452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neurology
Room A4 55
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 89351
Fax: (416) 480-5354
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIO MASELLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASELLIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2006