Mashal, Orly Haviva (CPSO#: 58080)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Sep 1955
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009