Mashari, Azad (CPSO#: 88354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
Em3-436
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3567
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZAD MASHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASHARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Feb 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013