Mashouf-Fard, Mahsa (CPSO#: 90450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402/414
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 237-7723
Fax: (905) 291-0768
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHSA MASHOUF-FARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASHOUF-FARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2012