Masiakos, Peter Theodore (CPSO#: 78325)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Boston University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004