Maskalyk, Milton James (CPSO#: 74015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maskalyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maskalyk ( CPSO# 74015 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital - ER Dept.
Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5095

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILTON JAMES MASKALYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASKALYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004