Maskens, Peter Duncan (CPSO#: 33508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
849 Alexander Court
Suite 205
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone: (705) 741-5510
Fax: (705) 741-0448
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Maskens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Maskens ( CPSO# 33508 )

Business Address:
205 - 849 Alexander Court
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone Number: (705) 741-5510

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER DUNCAN MASKENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASKENS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1982