Maslow, Kenny David (CPSO#: 77417)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 May 2002 to 02 Jun 2002
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2005