Masner, Radek (CPSO#: 65089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
580 Court St.
Keene NH  03431
United States
Phone: (603) 354-5454 Ext. 6002
Fax: (603) 354-5448

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New Hampshire

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RADEK MASNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1993