Mason, Deborah Fleur (CPSO#: 77115)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Otago, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 07 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jul 2003