Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mason, Robert Barnes (CPSO#: 65262)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43482
Fax: (705) 739-5629
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgian Radiology Consultants
121 Wellington Street West
Suite 114
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Canada
Phone: (705) 726-4531
Fax: (705) 739-0810
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Georgian Bay General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Canada
Phone: (705) 526-3751
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert B. Mason Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mason ( CPSO# 65262 )

Business Address:
121 Wellington Street West
Suite 114-115
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Phone Number: (705) 726-4531

Business Address:
The Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
Little Lake Health Centre
LL01
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 722-8036

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT BARNES MASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993