Mason, Robin Liang Dominic (CPSO#: 28428)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 28 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Mason's medical records are being stored at: Acne Treatment Clinic Suite 412 4190 Finch Ave E. Scarborough, ON M1S 4T7 Alternative inquiries may be made at: Acne Treatment Clinic Suite 406 1366 Yonge St. Toronto, ON M4T 3A7
Date Received: 03 Apr 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Mar 2013