Mason, Stephanie Amanda Ann (CPSO#: 98545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
602-500 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE AMANDA ANN MASON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MASON is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MASON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MASON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MASON shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MASON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MASON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017