Masood, Ali Khaja (CPSO#: 92455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Feb 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department of Internal Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Feb 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Oct 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Ali  Khaja Masood may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine
            in a hospital setting, only.