Masood, Amna (CPSO#: 83064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
PO Box 2030
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 437-6092
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amna Masood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Masood ( CPSO# 83064 )

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMNA MASOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 24 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Jul 2008 to 25 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Jul 2009 to 26 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012