Masood, Asim Cameron (CPSO#: 71347)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2110
Fax: (905) 494-6206
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asim Masood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Masood ( CPSO# 71347 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASIM CAMERON MASOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999