Masood, Khaja Mohammed (CPSO#: 23440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Mar 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Medical Centre
Suite 370
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone: (807) 345-2113
Fax: (807) 345-2114
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Mdac Medical Diagnostic And
Consulting
Suite 1
820 Red River Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 1K2
Canada
Phone: (807) 683-2115
Fax: (807) 683-4420
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khaja Masood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Masood ( CPSO# 23440 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Med Centre
370 - 63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone Number: (807) 345-2113

Business Address:
1 - 820 Red River Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 1K2
Phone Number: (807) 683-4420

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 14 Mar 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 14 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from March 14, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Khaja Mohammed
            Masood, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Masood to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                       DR. KHAJA MOHAMMED MASOOD
                                            ("Dr. Masood")
                                                  to
                           THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")
                        
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Masood, certificate of registration number 23440, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (2)   I, Dr. Masood, understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.

            (3)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Masood, undertake that, effective immediately, I will cease
                        to practice and/or engage in sleep medicine, including in the role
                        of sleep medicine associate.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Masood, acknowledge that, should I seek to change my scope
                        of practice, I shall obtain written approval from the College
                        before doing so, and acknowledge that in order to obtain such
                        approval, I shall be required to enter into a further undertaking
                        with the College to facilitate my change in scope of practice.
                  
            (4)   Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Masood, undertake to the College that, effective
                        immediately, I shall post a sign in the waiting rooms of any
                        location where I previously practiced sleep medicine, in a clearly
                        visible location, attached hereto as Appendix "A" that states:
                  
                        Dr. Masood must not practice or engage in sleep medicine.
                  
                  
                  
                  
            (5)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Masood, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Masood, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Masood, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or
                        any person or institution that may have relevant information, in
                        order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions
                        of this Undertaking. I have executed the OHIP consent form attached
                        hereto as Appendix "B".
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Masood, undertake to comply with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Masood, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Masood, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Masood, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Masood, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (11)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Masood, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Masood, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Masood's sleep medicine practice was assessed by the
                              College and, as a result, Dr. Masood must not practise or
                              engage in sleep medicine at this time.
                  
                              Dr. Masood shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting
                              rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
                              "Dr. Masood must not practice or engage in sleep medicine.
                              Further information may be found on the College of Physicians
                              and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Masood, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any hospital or Practice
                  Location where I practice or have privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and
                  to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has
                  that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or
                  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Khaja Mohammed Masood to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 14, 2017:

Dr. Masood's sleep medicine practice was assessed by the College and, as a result, Dr. Masood must not practise or engage in sleep medicine at this time.

Dr. Masood shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Masood must not practice or engage in sleep medicine. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".