Masoudi, Parviz (CPSO#: 91220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2012

Expiry Date:  04 Oct 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Oct 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department Internal Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000 Ext. 6030
Fax: (807) 684-5894
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Hospital
35 Algoma St. N
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Canada
Phone: (807) 343-2431
Fax: (807) 684-5894
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parviz Masoudi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Masoudi ( CPSO# 91220 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Hospital
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6G7
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department of Internal Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6030

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Oct 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 2009 to 11 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Oct 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Parviz Masoudi may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that is approved by the Chair, Division of Clinical
                        Medicine, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. Masoudi
                        holds an academic  appointment  at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of  issuance or when Dr. Masoudi  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Masoudi's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual  report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Masoudi's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  October  5, 2012.  In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will,  if  not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on October 4, 2019.