Masri, Mamdouh Essa Saeed (CPSO#: 75714)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 31 Aug 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007