Masri, Sam (CPSO#: 65653)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Spanish

Education:University Central Del Este, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 6
315 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M4V 2H2
Phone: (416) 972-9273
Fax: (416) 972-0842
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sam Masri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Masri ( CPSO# 65653 )

Business Address:
6 - 315 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M4V 2H2
Phone Number: (416) 972-9273

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAM MASRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1999 to 31 Jul 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2000 to 31 Jul 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 03 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2002