Massad, Joseph (CPSO#: 59655)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ashdale Medical Centre
1566 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4L 1E9
Phone: (416) 469-5338
Fax: (416) 469-1175
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Massad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Massad ( CPSO# 59655 )

Business Address:
Ashdale Medical Centre
1566 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4L 1E9
Phone Number: (416) 469-5338

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH MASSAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASSAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1989