Massalha, Samia (CPSO#: 110847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 27 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
Department of Cardiology
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-4044
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMIA MASSALHA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MASSALHA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. MASSALHA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MASSALHA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MASSALHA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. MASSALHA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. MASSALHA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2016 to 26 Oct 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 27 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018