Massarella, Carys (CPSO#: 62129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: Massarella, Calum Ralph (used until: 04 Oct 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o Randy Coutts
Emergency Department
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33112
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

145 Queenston St., Suite 100
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 688-2558
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Massarella Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Massarella ( CPSO# 62129 )

Business Address:
100 - 145 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 688-2558

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Emergency Department
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARYS MASSARELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASSARELLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991