Massel, David Richard (CPSO#: 53075)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 335 1900 Richmond Road Victoria, BC V8R 4R2
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1983 to 14 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014