Masselink, William Stephen (CPSO#: 87381)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Aug 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010