Massicotte, Mary Patricia (CPSO#: 64179)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Paediatric Haematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006