Massicotte-Azarniouch, David (CPSO#: 107679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Division of Nephrology
75 Laurier Avenue East
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 562-5700
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MASSICOTTE-AZARNIOUCH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MASSICOTTE-AZARNIOUCH is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. MASSICOTTE-AZARNIOUCH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MASSICOTTE-AZARNIOUCH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MASSICOTTE-AZARNIOUCH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MASSICOTTE-AZARNIOUCH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MASSICOTTE-AZARNIOUCH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018