Massoud, Reza (CPSO#: 63556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Arnprior Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone: (613) 623-3166
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Provis endpscopy clinic
2 Gurdwara street, unit 100
Ottawa ON  K2E 7X6
Canada
Phone: 613-216-1823
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan St N
Renfrew ON  K7V1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Rd
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
Phone: (613) 258-6133
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Reza Massoud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Massoud ( CPSO# 63556 )

Business Address:
Arnprior Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Business Address:
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-4851

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Business Address:
2 Gurdwara Avenue
Suite 100
Nepean ON  K2E 7X6
Phone Number: (613) 216-1823

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REZA MASSOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASSOUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 18 Sep 1995 to 23 Sep 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992