Massoud, Sherief (CPSO#: 32633)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Massoud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017