Masterson, Grainne Mary (CPSO#: 77603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 38
2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 792-2211
Fax: (905) 792-2901
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grainne M Masterson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Masterson ( CPSO# 77603 )

Business Address:
38 - 2130 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 792-2211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAINNE MARY MASTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASTERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2004