Mastracci, Tara Marie (CPSO#: 75172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Royal Free Foundation Trust
Vascular Surgery, 9th Floor East
Pond Street
London NW3 2QG
United Kingdom
Phone: 02078302163 Ext. +44

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA MARIE MASTRACCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASTRACCI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005