Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mastrogiacomo, Caterina (CPSO#: 59714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite C06
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V1
Phone: (416) 658-5228
Fax: (416) 658-5585
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caterina Mastrogiacomo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mastrogiacomo ( CPSO# 59714 )

Business Address:
C06 - 3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 658-5228

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATERINA MASTROGIACOMO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASTROGIACOMO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1989