Mastronardi, Diego Gerrard (CPSO#: 61010)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Graves-Gilbert Clinic
P O Box 90007
201 Park Street
Bowling Green KY  42101
United States
Phone: (270) 781-5111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Kentucky

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIEGO GERRARD MASTRONARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASTRONARDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1990