Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Matangi, Murray Frank (CPSO#: 58994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Heart Clinic
460 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1C2
Phone: (613) 544-3242
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURRAY FRANK MATANGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATANGI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1991