Matanovic-Todorovic, Dragana (CPSO#: 81413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Nis, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone: (519) 533-6962
Fax: (519)533-6963
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A1
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Matanovic-Todorovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Matanovic-Todorovic ( CPSO# 81413 )

Business Address:
Unit 102
333 Athlone Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone Number: (519) 533-6962

Business Address:
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A1
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 21 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DRAGANA MATANOVIC-TODOROVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATANOVIC-TODOROVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 17 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 18 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2014