Matar, Wadih Youssef (CPSO#: 79506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WADIH YOUSSEF MATAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2018