Mathai, George (CPSO#: 30723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Oct 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Madras, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Medical Place
695 Coronation Blvd.
Suite 5
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9
Phone: (519) 623-2830
Fax: (519) 623-9569
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathai-Wagg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mathai ( CPSO# 95206 )
Dr. I. Wagg ( CPSO# 90903 )
Dr. B. Wagg ( CPSO# 29190 )
Dr. G. Mathai ( CPSO# 30723 )
Dr. S. George ( CPSO# 30797 )

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 549-3181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 11 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 11 Oct 2012 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 11, 2012, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. George Mathai, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Mathai to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Mathai will no longer conduct breast examinations on female patients.