Mathen, Mathen Kayyalakakatha (CPSO#: 56075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Jul 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Misericordia Health Centre
233 - 99 Cornish Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R3C 1A2
Phone: (204) 788-8564

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Nov 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2005

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2005 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Mathen  Kayyalakakatha  Mathen  may  practise  only  in  the area of
                  medicine in which he is educated and experienced.

            2.    Dr.  Mathen agrees that his practice will be the subject of an assessment
                  by the  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Ontario  after he has
                  practised medicine in Ontario for one year.