Mather, Dawood Gulam (CPSO#: 25481)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 25 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dawood Mather Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 2012