Mather, Mahomed Saied (CPSO#: 27156)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Brantford General Hospital, 200 Terrace Hill Street, Brantford, ON, N3R 1G9
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016