Mather, Susan Allison (CPSO#: 58179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3958 Petrolia Line
R R 4
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone: (519) 882-1678
Fax: (519) 882-0533
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wyoming Medical Clinic
546 Niagara Street
Wyoming ON  N0N 1T0
Canada
Phone: (519) 845-3545
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mather Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mather ( CPSO# 58179 )

Business Address:
546 Niagara Street
Wyoming ON  N0N 1T0
Phone Number: (519) 845-3545

Business Address:
3958 Petrolia Line
R R #4
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-1678

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ALLISON MATHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1989