Mathers, Paul Gordon (CPSO#: 75731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-751-5544
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Mathers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mathers ( CPSO# 75731 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL GORDON MATHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2008