Mathew, Alexander Peedikayil (CPSO#: 67330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1996

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Vincent Physician Group
3231 Mitchell Road
Bedford IN  47421
United States
Phone: (812) 279-9771
Fax: (812) 2790092

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER PEEDIKAYIL MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1996

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On January 27, 2012, at the Lawrence Superior Court in Indiana, a finding of Malpractice was made against Dr. Mathew.