Mathew, Cizy (CPSO#: 79348)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:Calicut University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 523-5663
Fax: (705) 523-1377
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boji Varghese and Cizy Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mathew ( CPSO# 79348 )
Dr. B. Varghese ( CPSO# 78623 )

Business Address:
410 - 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 523-5663

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 13 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CIZY MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2003