Mathew, Mangalam Thomas (CPSO#: 44024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Algoma District Medical Group
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234 Ext. 5645
Fax: (705) 541-2231
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. R. Gieni ( CPSO# 67230 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. S. Fratesi ( CPSO# 27368 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. E. Barrett ( CPSO# 56931 )
Dr. D. Beck ( CPSO# 50245 )
Dr. E. Beduhn ( CPSO# 26647 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. D. Brooks ( CPSO# 26921 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. D. Burrows ( CPSO# 50233 )
Dr. P. Catania ( CPSO# 31907 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. R. Tull ( CPSO# 93890 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Thomas Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )

Business Address:
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANGALAM THOMAS MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1985