Mathew, Roy Kuntharayil Thomas (CPSO#: 74843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
186 Main Street South
Brampton ON  L6W 2E2
Phone: (905) 456-7774
Fax: (905) 456-1158
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roy K. T. Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mathew ( CPSO# 74843 )

Business Address:
186 Main Street South
Brampton ON  L6W 2E2
Phone Number: (905) 456-7774

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROY KUNTHARAYIL THOMAS MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 26 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003