Mathew, Silvy Mary (CPSO#: 82454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Loblaws on the Mezzanine
My Family MD
396 St Clair West
Toronto ON  M5P 3N3
Phone: (416) 928-9343
Fax: (416) 928-9368
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

55 Belmont St.
Toronto ON  M5R 1R1
Canada
Phone: (416) 964-9231 Ext. 214
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Silvy Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mathew ( CPSO# 82454 )

Business Address:
Loblaws on the Mezzanine
My Family MD
396 St. Clair West
Toronto ON  M5P 3N3
Phone Number: (416) 928-9343

Business Address:
55 Belmont Street
Toronto ON  M5R 1R1
Phone Number: (416) 964-9231

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SILVY MARY MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Nov 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007