Mathews, John (CPSO#: 66339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Bombay, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Fax: (519) 253-9257
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathews Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mathews ( CPSO# 66339 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone Number: (519) 253-5253

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L6
Phone Number: (519) 254-1661

Business Address:
Hôtel-Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 May 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MATHEWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEWS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1993